Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 5 Online
» 133 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 17936 Week
» 70952 Month
» 190479 Year
» 3217332 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
Post 1948 (1955 Num) |
13046 |
09/04/1954 |
|
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
D3046 |
16/11/1957 |
|
TOPS (Tops) |
08033 |
05/1974 |
|
Liveries Carried - WIP
Code |
Colour |
Date From |
BFYE |
BR Blue bodywork, full yellow cab front |
by 06/1969 |
BFYE |
BR Blue bodywork, full yellow cab front |
by 12/1975 |
|
Configuration - WIP
Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Diagram |
Source |
09/04/1954 |
v |
Vacuum brakes |
|
|
|
|
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
09/04/1954 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number 13046 Built at Derby Works Allocated to Norwood Junction (75C) |
|
|
06/11/1954 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Hither Green (73C) |
|
|
10/10/1955 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Ashford (74A) |
|
|
19/12/1955 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Norwood Junction (75C) |
|
|
27/01/1956 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Eastleigh (71A) |
|
|
16/11/1957 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 3046 |
|
|
24/02/1958 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Norwood Junction (75C) |
|
|
02/07/1962 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Feltham (70B) |
|
|
23/09/1968 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to To London Midland Region (91M) |
|
|
12/10/1968 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Chester (MR) (6A) |
|
|
06/1969 |
Livery |
Change of livery to BR Blue bodywork, full yellow cab front |
|
|
23/03/1974 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Tinsley (TI) |
|
|
23/03/1974 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to To Eastern Region (91E) |
|
|
05/1974 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 08033 |
|
|
12/1975 |
Livery |
Change of livery to BR Blue bodywork, full yellow cab front |
|
|
06/01/1985 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 08033 from Tinsley (TI) |
|
|
28/02/1986 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by Locomotive Works: Swindon |
|
|