Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 6 Online
» 49 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 17852 Week
» 70868 Month
» 190395 Year
» 3217248 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
London and South Western Railway |
230 |
m/e |
12/1894 |
Southern Railway (Pfx) |
E230 |
m/e |
05/1927 |
Southern Railway (1931) |
230 |
m/e |
02/1936 |
British Railways |
30230 |
m/e |
06/1950 |
Liveries Carried
Colour |
Lining |
Date From |
LSWR Maunsell Green |
Black and White |
05/1927 |
BR Black |
Red and White |
06/1950 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
W. Adams |
Class |
O2 |
Company History |
LSWR/SR |
Wheels |
0-4-4T |
Builder |
Nine Elms Works |
Order Number |
R6 |
To Service |
During 12/1894 |
Withdrawal |
Fri 20/07/1956 |
Service Life |
61 yrs, 7 mths , 20 dys |
Disposal
Scrapping |
During 09/1956 |
|
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
REINS |
71C |
Dorchester |
5w/e |
08/10/1951 |
ALLOC |
70B |
Feltham |
8w/e |
19/03/1952 |
REINS |
70B |
Feltham |
8w/e |
05/06/1956 |
WDN |
|
|
on |
20/07/1956 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
12/1894 |
To Service |
To service as London and South Western Railway Number 230 Built at Nine Elms Works |
|
|
05/1927 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to E230 |
|
|
02/1936 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 230 |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Exmouth Junction (EXJ) |
|
|
06/1950 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 30230 |
|
|
06/10/1951 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Dorchester (71C) |
|
|
19/03/1952 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Feltham (70B) |
|
|
20/07/1956 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 30230 |
|
|
09/1956 |
Scrapped |
Scrapped |
|
|