Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 18 Online
» 825 Today
» 4868 Yesterday
» 19736 Week
» 84690 Month
» 287354 Year
» 3314207 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
London and South Western Railway |
178 |
m/e |
12/1889 |
Southern Railway (Pfx) |
E178 |
m/e |
08/1926 |
Southern Railway (1931) |
178 |
m/e |
11/1932 |
Southern Railway (IOW) |
W14 |
m/e |
05/1936 |
Liveries Carried
Colour |
Lining |
Date From |
LSWR Maunsell Green |
Black and White |
08/1926 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
W. Adams |
Class |
O2 |
Company History |
LSWR/SR |
Wheels |
0-4-4T |
Builder |
Nine Elms Works |
Order Number |
O2 |
To Service |
During 12/1889 |
Withdrawal |
During 12/1966 |
Service Life |
77 yrs |
Total Mileage |
1,411,809 |
|
Allocations
Code |
Subsequent Codes |
Name |
|
From Date |
|
|
(New) |
m/e |
12/1889 |
|
|
Withdrawn |
m/e |
12/1966 |
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
TOSTORE |
|
|
5w/e |
31/10/1950 |
TOSTORE |
70H |
Ryde (I.O.W.) |
8w/e |
08/02/1955 |
REINS |
70H |
Ryde (I.O.W.) |
w/e |
13/06/1955 |
WDN |
|
|
w/e |
01/01/1967 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
12/1889 |
To Service |
To service as London and South Western Railway Number 178 Built at Nine Elms Works |
|
|
08/1926 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to E178 |
|
|
11/1932 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 178 |
|
|
05/1936 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to W14 |
|
|
12/1966 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 14 |
|
|