Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 21 Online
» 239 Today
» 5784 Yesterday
» 6023 Week
» 27412 Month
» 146939 Year
» 3173792 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
Post 1948 (1955 Num) |
13044 |
17/03/1954 |
|
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
D3044 |
01/03/1958 |
|
TOPS (Tops) |
08032 |
05/1974 |
|
Liveries Carried - WIP
Code |
Colour |
Date From |
BFYE |
BR Blue bodywork, full yellow cab front with black chevrons |
by 08/1968 |
|
Configuration - WIP
Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Diagram |
Source |
17/03/1954 |
v |
Vacuum brakes |
|
|
|
Preservation
Current Status |
Unknown |
|
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
17/03/1954 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number 13044 Built at Derby Works Allocated to Norwood Junction (75C) |
|
|
06/11/1954 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Hither Green (73C) |
|
|
07/07/1955 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Ashford (74A) |
|
|
01/03/1958 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 3044 |
|
|
30/07/1962 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Feltham (70B) |
|
|
29/07/1968 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Selhurst (75C) |
|
|
08/1968 |
Livery |
Change of livery to BR Blue bodywork, full yellow cab front with black chevrons |
|
|
23/09/1968 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to To London Midland Region (91M) |
|
|
12/10/1968 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Toton (16A) |
|
|
05/1974 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 08032 |
|
|
25/08/1974 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 08032 from Toton (TO) |
|
|