Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 22 Online
» 2264 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 15670 Week
» 68686 Month
» 188213 Year
» 3215066 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
E3043 |
25/11/1960 |
TOPS (Tops) |
84008 |
02/08/1972 |
|
Modifications
Date Modified |
Order Number |
Modification |
Status |
Charged to Capital |
Charged to Revenue |
Total Cost |
08/1972 |
|
Air Brakes fitted |
|
|
|
|
Configuration
Configuration Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Source |
25/11/1960 |
ve |
Vacuum braked, Electric Train Heating |
|
|
08/1972 |
xe |
Dual braked, Electric Train Heating |
|
|
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
25/11/1960 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number E3043 Built at North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow, Works Number 27800 |
|
|
08/1972 |
Modification |
Modification: Air Brakes fitted |
|
|
02/08/1972 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 84008 |
|
|
12/04/1975 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Crewe Electric (CE) |
|
|
26/10/1979 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 84008 from Crewe Electric (CE) |
|
|
30/11/1988 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by A Hampton: at Crewe Works |
|
|