Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 5 Online
» 166 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 17969 Week
» 70985 Month
» 190512 Year
» 3217365 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
Post 1948 (1955 Num) |
13038 |
28/11/1953 |
|
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
D3038 |
30/10/1959 |
At Derby Works |
|
Configuration - WIP
Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Diagram |
Source |
28/11/1953 |
v |
Vacuum brakes |
|
|
|
|
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
28/11/1953 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number 13038 Built at Swindon Works Allocated to Oxley (84B) |
|
|
30/10/1959 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 3038 |
|
|
22/04/1967 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Bescot (2F) |
|
|
19/10/1968 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Chester (MR) (6A) |
|
|
21/10/1972 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Longsight (9A) |
|
|
30/12/1972 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 3038 from Longsight (9A) |
|
|
05/1980 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by National Coal Board: Bates Colliery |
|
|