Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 22 Online
» 1353 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 19156 Week
» 72172 Month
» 191699 Year
» 3218552 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
Post 1948 (1955 Num) |
13034 |
28/11/1953 |
|
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
D3034 |
01/09/1959 |
At Horwich Works |
|
Modifications - WIP
Date Modified |
Order Number |
Modification |
Status |
Charged to Capital |
Charged to Revenue |
Total Cost |
06/1971 |
|
Radio telephone fitted |
|
|
|
|
Configuration - WIP
Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Diagram |
Source |
28/11/1953 |
v |
Vacuum brakes |
|
|
|
06/1971 |
vr |
Vacuum brakes, Radio Telephone fitted |
|
|
|
|
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
28/11/1953 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number 13034 Built at Swindon Works Allocated to Oxley (84B) |
|
|
01/09/1959 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 3034 |
|
|
23/01/1965 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Monument Lane (2H) |
|
|
22/04/1967 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Bescot (2F) |
|
|
01/06/1968 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Toton (16A) |
|
|
06/1971 |
Modification |
Modification: Radio telephone fitted |
|
|
16/10/1971 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Doncaster (36A) |
|
|
08/07/1972 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Tinsley (41A) |
|
|
19/11/1972 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 3034 from Tinsley (41A) |
|
|
11/1973 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by Locomotive Works: Derby |
|
|