Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 19 Online
» 1897 Today
» 4720 Yesterday
» 25528 Week
» 90482 Month
» 293146 Year
» 3319999 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
Post 1948 (1955 Num) |
13032 |
31/10/1953 |
|
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
D3032 |
01/01/1958 |
|
TOPS (Tops) |
08024 |
05/1974 |
|
|
Configuration - WIP
Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Diagram |
Source |
31/10/1953 |
v |
Vacuum brakes |
|
|
|
|
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
31/10/1953 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number 13032 Built at Swindon Works Allocated to Old Oak Common (81A) |
|
|
01/01/1958 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 3032 |
|
|
22/07/1967 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Crewe Diesel (5A) |
|
|
27/05/1972 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Tinsley (41A) |
|
|
05/1974 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 08024 |
|
|
26/12/1982 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 08024 from Tinsley (TI) |
|
|
08/1983 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by Locomotive Works: Doncaster |
|
|