Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 4 Online
» 332 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 18135 Week
» 71151 Month
» 190678 Year
» 3217531 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
Post 1948 (1955 Num) |
13029 |
03/10/1953 |
|
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
D3029 |
24/12/1957 |
|
TOPS (Tops) |
08021 |
04/1974 |
|
Locomotive Specifics
Class as Built |
08 |
Subclass/Rebuild History |
|
Wheels |
0-6-0 |
Builder |
Swindon Works |
Order Number |
412 |
To Service |
03/10/1953 to Tyseley (84E) |
Withdrawn |
07/12/1986 off Toton (TO) |
Time in Service |
33 yrs, 2 mths , 4 dys |
Status |
Preserved |
Liveries Carried - WIP
Code |
Colour |
Date From |
BFYE |
BR Blue bodywork, full yellow cab front with black chevrons |
by 07/1971 |
|
Modifications - WIP
Date Modified |
Order Number |
Modification |
Status |
Charged to Capital |
Charged to Revenue |
Total Cost |
06/1971 |
|
Radio telephone removed |
|
|
|
|
Configuration - WIP
Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Diagram |
Source |
03/10/1953 |
v |
Vacuum brakes |
|
|
|
06/1971 |
v |
Vacuum brakes |
|
|
|
Preservation
Current Status |
Unknown |
|
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
03/10/1953 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number 13029 Built at Swindon Works Allocated to Tyseley (84E) |
|
|
24/12/1957 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 3029 |
|
|
13/08/1960 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Stourbridge Junction (84F) |
|
|
22/04/1967 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Bescot (2F) |
|
|
13/07/1968 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Toton (16A) |
|
|
06/1971 |
Modification |
Modification: Radio telephone removed |
|
|
07/1971 |
Livery |
Change of livery to BR Blue bodywork, full yellow cab front with black chevrons |
|
|
04/1974 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 08021 |
|
|
07/12/1986 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 08021 from Toton (TO) |
|
|