Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 16 Online
» 1054 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 18857 Week
» 71873 Month
» 191400 Year
» 3218253 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
Post 1948 (1955 Num) |
13025 |
05/09/1953 |
|
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
D3025 |
02/05/1960 |
At Swindon Works |
TOPS (Tops) |
08018 |
05/1974 |
|
|
Configuration - WIP
Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Diagram |
Source |
05/09/1953 |
v |
Vacuum brakes |
|
|
|
|
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
05/09/1953 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number 13025 Built at Swindon Works Allocated to Tyseley (84E) |
|
|
02/05/1960 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 3025 |
|
|
13/08/1960 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Stourbridge Junction (84F) |
|
|
22/04/1967 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Bescot (2F) |
|
|
01/06/1968 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Toton (16A) |
|
|
14/02/1970 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Burton (16F) |
|
|
06/10/1973 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Toton (TO) |
|
|
05/1974 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 08018 |
|
|
17/07/1983 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 08018 from Allerton (AN) |
|
|
14/09/1985 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by Locomotive Works: Swindon |
|
|