Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 10 Online
» 789 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 14195 Week
» 67211 Month
» 186738 Year
» 3213591 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
Post 1948 (1955 Num) |
13021 |
16/05/1953 |
|
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
D3021 |
08/02/1958 |
|
TOPS (Tops) |
08014 |
05/1974 |
|
Liveries Carried - WIP
Code |
Colour |
Date From |
BFYE |
BR Blue bodywork, full yellow cab front with black chevrons |
by 06/1971 |
|
Configuration - WIP
Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Diagram |
Source |
16/05/1953 |
v |
Vacuum brakes |
|
|
|
|
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
16/05/1953 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number 13021 Built at Derby Works Allocated to Ryecroft (Walsall) (3C) |
|
|
08/02/1958 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 3021 |
|
|
22/04/1967 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Bescot (2F) |
|
|
08/06/1968 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Toton (16A) |
|
|
06/1971 |
Livery |
Change of livery to BR Blue bodywork, full yellow cab front with black chevrons |
|
|
05/1974 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 08014 |
|
|
12/1977 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Burton (BU) |
|
|
18/05/1980 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 08014 from Bury (BV) |
|
|
30/11/1981 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by C F Booth: Rotherham |
|
|