Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 19 Online
» 2274 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 20077 Week
» 73093 Month
» 192620 Year
» 3219473 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
Post 1948 (1955 Num) |
13020 |
18/04/1953 |
|
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
D3020 |
01/02/1958 |
|
TOPS (Tops) |
08013 |
|
|
Liveries Carried - WIP
Code |
Colour |
Date From |
BFYE |
BR Blue bodywork, full yellow cab front with black chevrons |
by 05/1971 |
BFYE |
BR Blue bodywork, full yellow cab front with black chevrons |
by 06/1971 |
|
Allocations - WIP
Code |
Subsequent Codes |
Name |
|
From Date |
3D |
|
Aston (New) |
on |
18/04/1953 |
2E |
|
Saltley |
w/e |
16/10/1965 |
|
|
Stored |
3w/e |
06/10/1973 |
|
|
Withdrawn |
on |
01/12/1973 |
Configuration - WIP
Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Diagram |
Source |
18/04/1953 |
v |
Vacuum brakes |
|
|
|
|
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
18/04/1953 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number 13020 Built at Derby Works Allocated to Aston (3D) |
|
|
01/02/1958 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 3020 |
|
|
16/10/1965 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Saltley (2E) |
|
|
05/1971 |
Livery |
Change of livery to BR Blue bodywork, full yellow cab front with black chevrons |
|
|
06/1971 |
Livery |
Change of livery to BR Blue bodywork, full yellow cab front with black chevrons |
|
|
1973 |
Number Allocated |
Allocated number 08013 but not taken up |
|
|
06/10/1973 |
To Store |
To Store |
|
|
01/12/1973 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 3020 |
|
|
04/1975 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by Locomotive Works: Derby |
|
|