Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 1 Online
» 561 Today
» 5784 Yesterday
» 6345 Week
» 27734 Month
» 147261 Year
» 3174114 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
Post 1948 (1955 Num) |
13019 |
21/03/1953 |
|
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
D3019 |
06/1957 |
|
TOPS (Tops) |
08012 |
|
|
Locomotive Specifics
Class as Built |
08 |
Subclass/Rebuild History |
|
Wheels |
0-6-0 |
Builder |
Derby Works |
Order Number |
232 |
To Service |
21/03/1953 to Willesden (1A) |
Withdrawn |
10/06/1973 off Allerton (AN) |
Time in Service |
20 yrs, 2 mths , 20 dys |
Status |
Preserved |
|
Configuration - WIP
Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Diagram |
Source |
21/03/1953 |
v |
Vacuum brakes |
|
|
|
Preservation
Current Status |
Unknown |
|
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
21/03/1953 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number 13019 Built at Derby Works Allocated to Willesden (1A) |
|
|
06/1957 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 3019 |
|
|
28/12/1957 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Crewe South (5B) |
|
|
06/09/1958 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Speke Junction (8C) |
|
|
30/03/1963 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Edge Hill (8A) |
|
|
11/05/1968 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Allerton (8J) |
|
|
1973 |
Number Allocated |
Allocated number 08012 but not taken up |
|
|
10/06/1973 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 3019 from Allerton (AN) |
|
|