Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 24 Online
» 1529 Today
» 5784 Yesterday
» 7313 Week
» 28702 Month
» 148229 Year
» 3175082 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
Post 1948 (1955 Num) |
13018 |
21/03/1953 |
|
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
D3018 |
12/07/1958 |
|
TOPS (Tops) |
08011 |
06/1974 |
|
Locomotive Specifics
Class as Built |
08 |
Subclass/Rebuild History |
|
Wheels |
0-6-0 |
Builder |
Derby Works |
Order Number |
232 |
To Service |
21/03/1953 to Willesden (1A) |
Withdrawn |
13/12/1991 off Reading (W.R.) (RG) |
Time in Service |
38 yrs, 8 mths , 22 dys |
Cut Up |
08/05/1992 |
Status |
Preserved |
|
Configuration - WIP
Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Diagram |
Source |
21/03/1953 |
v |
Vacuum brakes |
|
|
|
Preservation
Preservation Date |
25/04/1992 |
Current Status |
Operational |
Status Date |
19/03/2011 |
Information |
This loco was at one time the oldest surviving diesel on British Railways - it was finally withdrawn due to being vacuum braked only in 1991. |
Link |
www.chinnorrailway.co.uk/ |
|
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
21/03/1953 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number 13018 Built at Derby Works Allocated to Willesden (1A) |
|
|
12/07/1958 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 3018 |
|
|
22/05/1971 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Cricklewood East (14A) |
|
|
17/07/1971 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Bletchley (1E) |
|
|
06/1974 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 08011 |
|
|
13/12/1991 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 08011 from Reading (W.R.) (RG) |
|
|
08/05/1992 |
Scrapped |
Scrapped |
|
|