Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 22 Online
» 1806 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 15212 Week
» 68228 Month
» 187755 Year
» 3214608 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
E3017 |
05/05/1961 |
TOPS (Tops) |
81015 |
03/05/1973 |
|
Modifications
Date Modified |
Order Number |
Modification |
Status |
Charged to Capital |
Charged to Revenue |
Total Cost |
05/1973 |
|
Air Brakes fitted |
|
|
|
|
Configuration
Configuration Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Source |
05/05/1961 |
ve |
Vacuum braked, Electric Train Heating |
|
|
05/1973 |
xe |
Dual braked, Electric Train Heating |
|
|
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
05/05/1961 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number E3017 Built at Birmingham Railway Carriage & Wagon Company, Works Number 1099 |
|
|
05/1973 |
Modification |
Modification: Air Brakes fitted |
|
|
03/05/1973 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 81015 |
|
|
26/01/1974 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Glasgow Shields Road (GS) |
|
|
11/05/1974 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Crewe Electric (CE) |
|
|
29/03/1975 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Glasgow Shields Road (GW) |
|
|
17/12/1984 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 81015 |
|
|
29/05/1992 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by MC Metals: Springburn |
|
|