Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 27 Online
» 2309 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 15715 Week
» 68731 Month
» 188258 Year
» 3215111 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
Post 1948 (1955 Num) |
13017 |
21/03/1953 |
|
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
D3017 |
05/1957 |
|
TOPS (Tops) |
08010 |
05/1974 |
|
|
Configuration - WIP
Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Diagram |
Source |
21/03/1953 |
v |
Vacuum brakes |
|
|
|
|
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
21/03/1953 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number 13017 Built at Derby Works Allocated to Willesden (1A) |
|
|
05/1957 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 3017 |
|
|
26/03/1960 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Camden (1B) |
|
|
03/01/1966 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Willesden (1A) |
|
|
05/1974 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 08010 |
|
|
18/12/1977 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 08010 from Willesden (WN) |
|
|
28/02/1978 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by Locomotive Works: Eastleigh |
|
|