Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 14 Online
» 2980 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 16386 Week
» 69402 Month
» 188929 Year
» 3215782 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
Post 1948 (1955 Num) |
13016 |
24/01/1953 |
|
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
D3016 |
12/1957 |
|
TOPS (Tops) |
08009 |
05/1974 |
|
|
Configuration - WIP
Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Diagram |
Source |
24/01/1953 |
v |
Vacuum brakes |
|
|
|
|
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
24/01/1953 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number 13016 Built at Derby Works Allocated to Willesden (1A) |
|
|
12/1957 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 3016 |
|
|
17/09/1960 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Camden (1B) |
|
|
05/11/1960 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Willesden (1A) |
|
|
27/04/1974 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Ashford Chart Leacon (AF) |
|
|
05/1974 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 08009 |
|
|
30/11/1975 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 08009 from Ashford Chart Leacon (AF) |
|
|
30/06/1976 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by Locomotive Works: Swindon |
|
|