Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 17 Online
» 3883 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 17289 Week
» 70305 Month
» 189832 Year
» 3216685 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
Post 1948 (1955 Num) |
13011 |
19/12/1952 |
|
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
D3011 |
17/05/1958 |
|
|
Configuration - WIP
Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Diagram |
Source |
19/12/1952 |
v |
Vacuum brakes |
|
|
|
|
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
19/12/1952 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number 13011 Built at Derby Works Allocated to Hither Green (73C) |
|
|
06/11/1954 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Eastleigh (71A) |
|
|
17/05/1958 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 3011 |
|
|
01/10/1972 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 3011 |
|
|
12/1985 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by Marples and Gillot: Sheffield |
|
|