Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 17 Online
» 4397 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 17803 Week
» 70819 Month
» 190346 Year
» 3217199 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
Post 1948 (1955 Num) |
13008 |
27/12/1952 |
|
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
D3008 |
30/06/1958 |
|
TOPS (Tops) |
08004 |
02/1974 |
|
Liveries Carried - WIP
Code |
Colour |
Date From |
BFYE |
BR Blue bodywork, full yellow cab front with black chevrons |
by 10/1969 |
BFYE |
BR Blue bodywork, full yellow cab front |
by 12/1975 |
|
Configuration - WIP
Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Diagram |
Source |
27/12/1952 |
v |
Vacuum brakes |
|
|
|
|
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
27/12/1952 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number 13008 Built at Derby Works Allocated to Hurlford (67B) |
|
|
30/06/1958 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 3008 |
|
|
05/11/1966 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Carnforth (10A) |
|
|
10/08/1968 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Barrow in Furness (12C) |
|
|
12/10/1968 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Lostock Hall (10D) |
|
|
25/01/1969 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Allerton (8J) |
|
|
10/1969 |
Livery |
Change of livery to BR Blue bodywork, full yellow cab front with black chevrons |
|
|
02/1974 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 08004 |
|
|
03/08/1974 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Gateshead (GD) |
|
|
28/12/1974 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Hull Botanic Gardens (BG) |
|
|
12/1975 |
Livery |
Change of livery to BR Blue bodywork, full yellow cab front |
|
|
07/12/1975 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Darlington (DN) |
|
|
21/08/1983 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 08004 from Thornaby (TE) |
|
|
30/09/1986 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by Locomotive Works: Swindon |
|
|