Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 7 Online
» 4302 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 17708 Week
» 70724 Month
» 190251 Year
» 3217104 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
E3005 |
04/05/1960 |
TOPS (Tops) |
81004 |
01/1975 |
|
Modifications
Date Modified |
Order Number |
Modification |
Status |
Charged to Capital |
Charged to Revenue |
Total Cost |
07/11/1972 |
|
Air Brakes fitted |
|
|
|
|
06/1984 |
|
Modified for One Man Operation |
|
|
|
|
Configuration
Configuration Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Source |
04/05/1960 |
ve |
Vacuum braked, Electric Train Heating |
|
|
07/11/1972 |
xe |
Dual braked, Electric Train Heating |
|
|
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
04/05/1960 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number E3005 Built at Birmingham Railway Carriage & Wagon Company, Works Number 1087 |
|
|
29/10/1960 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to London Midland - Western Lines (LMW) |
|
|
07/11/1972 |
Modification |
Modification: Air Brakes fitted |
|
|
01/1975 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 81004 |
|
|
29/03/1975 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Glasgow Shields Road (GW) |
|
|
06/1984 |
Modification |
Modification: Modified for One Man Operation |
|
|
30/04/1990 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 81004 |
|
|
21/05/1992 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by MC Metals: Springburn |
|
|