Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 15 Online
» 1100 Today
» 1408 Yesterday
» 3745 Week
» 6327 Month
» 270960 Year
» 1492525 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Type Number Date From Notes
Post 1948 (1955 Num) 13004 14/11/1952  
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) D3004 07/11/1957  
TOPS (Tops) 08001 02/1974  

Locomotive Specifics
Class as Built 08
Wheels 0-6-0
Builder Swindon Works
Order Number 404
To Service 14/11/1952
Withdrawn 30/06/1978 off Gateshead (GD)
Time in Service 25 yrs, 7 mths , 16 dys
Cut Up 31/03/1979
Cut At Locomotive Works (Swindon)
Status Scrapped

Allocations
Code Name Date From
84E Tyseley (New) 14/11/1952
84F Stourbridge Junction 4w/e 10/09/1960
6A Chester (MR) w/e 01/10/1966
6J Holyhead w/e 11/03/1967
36A Doncaster w/e 18/03/1972
40B Immingham w/e 01/07/1972
GD Gateshead w/e 18/10/1975
   Withdrawn 30/06/1978


Summary
Start End Event Details Source See Also
14/11/1952 To Service To service as 13004
Built at Derby Works
Allocated to Tyseley (84E)
   
07/11/1957 Renumbered Renumbered to D3004    
10/09/1960 Allocation Reallocated to Stourbridge Junction (84F)    
01/10/1966 Allocation Reallocated to Chester (Midland) (6A)    
11/03/1967 Allocation Reallocated to Holyhead (6J)    
06/02/1972 Sightings Derby Works visit: Around the works - Erecting shop. RO 4/1972 Link
18/03/1972 Allocation Reallocated to Doncaster (36A)    
01/07/1972 Allocation Reallocated to Immingham (40B)    
02/1974 Renumbered Renumbered to 08001    
18/10/1975 Allocation Reallocated to Gateshead (GD)    
30/06/1978 Withdrawn Condemned as 08001 from Gateshead (GD)    
31/03/1979 Scrapped Broken up by Locomotive Works: Swindon    

prev prev