Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 13 Online
» 1185 Today
» 5784 Yesterday
» 6969 Week
» 28358 Month
» 147885 Year
» 3174738 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
Post 1948 (1955 Num) |
13003 |
31/10/1952 |
|
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
D3003 |
26/07/1960 |
At Swindon Works |
|
Configuration - WIP
Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Diagram |
Source |
31/10/1952 |
v |
Vacuum brakes |
|
|
|
Preservation
Current Status |
Unknown |
|
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
31/10/1952 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number 13003 Built at Swindon Works Allocated to Tyseley (84E) |
|
|
26/12/1953 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to St Philips Marsh (82B) |
|
|
26/07/1960 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 3003 |
|
|
04/11/1961 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Bristol Bath Road (82A) |
|
|
29/11/1964 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Bristol Bath Road (82A) |
|
|
17/07/1972 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 3003 from Bristol Bath Road (82A) |
|
|
08/1988 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by Somerset County Council: Wanstrow |
|
|