Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 15 Online
» 688 Today
» 1091 Yesterday
» 8142 Week
» 10724 Month
» 275357 Year
» 1496922 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Type Number Date From Notes
Post 1948 (1955 Num) 13002 24/10/1952  
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) D3002 19/02/1960 At Swindon Works

Locomotive Specifics
Class as Built 08
Wheels 0-6-0
Builder Swindon Works
Order Number 404
To Service 24/10/1952 to Tyseley (84E)
Withdrawn 17/07/1972
Time in Service 19 yrs, 8 mths , 23 dys
Status Preserved

Allocations
Code Name Date From
84E Tyseley (New) 4w/e 01/11/1952
82B St Philips Marsh 4w/e 26/12/1953
82A Bristol Bath Road 4w/e 04/11/1961
82A Bristol Bath Road w/e 29/11/1964
   Withdrawn on 17/07/1972

Preservation
Current Status Unknown


Summary
Start End Event Details Source See Also
24/10/1952 To Service To service as 13002
Built at Derby Works
Allocated to Tyseley (84E)
   
26/12/1953 Allocation Reallocated to St Philips Marsh (82B)    
02/1960 Renumbered Renumbered to D3002    
04/11/1961 Allocation Reallocated to Bristol Bath Road (82A)    
29/11/1964 Allocation Reallocated to Bristol Bath Road (82A)    
17/07/1972 Withdrawn Condemned as D3002    

prev prev