Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 23 Online
» 4038 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 17444 Week
» 70460 Month
» 189987 Year
» 3216840 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
Post 1948 (1955 Num) |
13001 |
21/10/1952 |
|
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
D3001 |
06/05/1960 |
At Swindon Works |
|
Configuration - WIP
Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Diagram |
Source |
21/10/1952 |
v |
Vacuum brakes |
|
|
|
|
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
21/10/1952 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number 13001 Built at Swindon Works Allocated to Tyseley (84E) |
|
|
26/12/1953 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to St Philips Marsh (82B) |
|
|
06/05/1960 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 3001 |
|
|
04/11/1961 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Bristol Bath Road (82A) |
|
|
29/11/1964 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Bristol Bath Road (82A) |
|
|
15/03/1969 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Old Oak Common (81A) |
|
|
14/06/1969 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Neville Hill (55H) |
|
|
25/10/1969 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Stratford (30A) |
|
|
19/11/1972 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 3001 from Stratford (30A) |
|
|
11/1975 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by Locomotive Works: Doncaster |
|
|