Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 5 Online
» 145 Today
» 1257 Yesterday
» 145 Week
» 11438 Month
» 276071 Year
» 1497636 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Type Number Date From Notes
Post 1948 (1955 Num) 13001 21/10/1952  
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) D3001 06/05/1960 At Swindon Works

Locomotive Specifics
Class as Built 08
Wheels 0-6-0
Builder Swindon Works
Order Number 404
To Service 21/10/1952 to Tyseley (84E)
Withdrawn 19/11/1972
Time in Service 20 yrs , 29 dys
Cut Up 01/11/1975
Cut At Locomotive Works (Doncaster)
Status Scrapped

Allocations
Code Name Date From
84E Tyseley (New) 4w/e 01/11/1952
82B St Philips Marsh 4w/e 26/12/1953
82A Bristol Bath Road 4w/e 04/11/1961
82A Bristol Bath Road w/e 29/11/1964
81A Old Oak Common 5w/e 15/03/1969
55H Neville Hill w/e 14/06/1969
30A Stratford w/e 25/10/1969
   Withdrawn on 19/11/1972


Summary
Start End Event Details Source See Also
21/10/1952 To Service To service as 13001
Built at Derby Works
Allocated to Tyseley (84E)
   
26/12/1953 Allocation Reallocated to St Philips Marsh (82B)    
06/05/1960 Renumbered Renumbered to D3001    
04/11/1961 Allocation Reallocated to Bristol Bath Road (82A)    
29/11/1964 Allocation Reallocated to Bristol Bath Road (82A)    
15/03/1969 Allocation Reallocated to Old Oak Common (81A)    
14/06/1969 Allocation Reallocated to Neville Hill (55H)    
25/10/1969 Allocation Reallocated to Stratford (30A)    
19/11/1972 Withdrawn Condemned as D3001    
01/11/1975 Scrapped Broken up by Locomotive Works: Doncaster    

prev prev