31/12/1946 |
Swindon Works |
Locos. entering works during December included the following: 100, 1943, 2132, 2792, 2809, 2825, 2837, 2840, 2844, 2851, 2891, 2912, 2955, 2980, 2989, 3016, 3026, 3040, 3804, 3829, 3838, 3865, 4025, 4038, 4059, 4080, 4704, 4950, 4955, 5001, 5023, 5039, 5060, 5063, 5079, 5083, 5085, 5349, 5374, 5376, 5380, 5926, 5956, 5961, 6009, 6029, 6333, 6354, 6929, 6933, 6935, 6956, 7320, and W.D. 77001. Works' pilots during the same period have included: 200, 207, 242, 1731, 1732, 1761, 2723, and 2773. Practically all 57XX going through the works are now receiving a top-feed boiler. Locos. noted recently so altered are: 3766, 6709, 8711, 8753, and 8780 NEA (the latter was seen at Paddington on 28/12, working empty stock!). 5083 Bath Abbey ('Castle') is an oil burner with large tender having different shape fuel tanks. New 'Counties' reported are: 1020 (SRD), 1021 (PDN), and 1022 (LA) |
SLS/194702 |
31/03/1947 |
Swindon Works |
Locos. entering works during March included: 1701, 2401, 2474, 2534, 2612, 2702, 2787, 2843, 2908, 2924, 2938, 2981, 3018, 3024, 3029, 3447, 4000, 4075, 4098, 4318, 5001, 5014, 5057, 5065, 5066, 5077, 5093, 5348, 5367, 6320, 6340, 6394, 7316, L.M.S. 8454, W.D. 77288, 78671 and 79234. (Last of the present batch of W.D. 2-8-00 to undergo repair here). Further locos. to receive T.F. boilers are: 4634, 5423, 5750, 6414 and 7428. Works' pilots during March included: 200, 201, 242, 1731, 1795, 2733, 2773 and 3561. 5705 has appeared with the G.W.R. monogram painted on the pannier tanks. New engines reported are: 1027 WES, 1028 BRD, 9402/3 PDN. Straight-sided 4,000 gallon tenders: The design as modified to suit the 'Castles' differs from the original tenders built for the '1000' Class as follows: It is 6in. narrower across the sides to match the cab width of the engine, and the running-plate is lowered to the same height as that under the engine cab. (It may not be generally realised that the '1000' Class have wider cabs and slightly higher running-plates under the cabs than what has always been standard). The coal space between the tanks is narrower so as to maintain the width of tank unchanged, and the shovel hole is also narrower. There are one or two other very minor differences, but otherwise the two types are the same. It appears that while the modified design can be used with all engine classes for which 4,000 gallon tenders are authorised, the original type will be restricted to the '1000' Class. |
SLS/194705 |
30/04/1947 |
Swindon Works |
Locos. entering works during April included:- 2095, 2159, 2407, 2612, 2655, 2702, 2784, 2787, 2808, 2835, 2936, 2937, 2940, 2949, 2954, 2989, 3012, 3018, 3048, 3150, 3386, 3586, 3594, 4007, 4020, 4023, 4042, 4078, 4381, 4920, 4968, 4971, 5012, 5043, 5305, 5375, 5960, 5986, 6023, 6309, 6344, 6399, 6953, 6970, and L.M.S. 8465. Further 'Panniers' fitted with T.F. boilers are 3663, 8713, and 8794. Works' pilots during April included: 200, 207, 1542, 1795, 1796, 2723, 2773 and 3561. New engines reported are: 1029 PDN, 9404 PDN. |
SLS/194706 |
30/09/1947 |
Swindon Works |
Locos. entering Works during September included: Nos. 1005, 1925, 1935, 2112, 2148, 2195, 2444, 2551, 2612, 3005, 3017, 3022, 3023, 5318, 5319, 5335, 5398, W.D. 77368, 78543 an 79274. Works' pilots recently have been: Nos. 200, 2723, 2731, 2733 an 2768. No. 5049 CDF (ex Works 23/9) has been fitted with an experimental Swindon design mechanical lubricator (similar to that fitted to No. 4905) and also a 4-row superheater. The present batch of new 'Hall' Class locos. which are of the modified or '6959' Class are being fitted with straight sided tenders; No. 6974 and onwards are being lined out. |
SLS/194711 |
30/09/1947 |
Swindon Works |
Locos. entering Works during September included:-907, 1011, 1012, 2054, 2066, 2262, 2737, 2804, 2814, 2826, 3014, 3036, 3562, 3809, 3840, 4033, 4054, 4090, 4092, 4920, 4929, 4930, 4944, 4983, 4985, 4997, 5041, 5052, 5056, 5060, 5061, 5065, 5076, 5080, 5086, 5905, 5912, 5938, 5991, 6808, 6831, 6876, 7817, 7819, W.D.77508 an 78542; the latter having been stored since last July. The following were ex Works as follows:-Nos. 6972 (4/10), 6973 (8/10), 6974 (14/10), 6975 (18/10), 6976 (29/10), 79274 (7/10), 78543 (16/10). Works' pilots recently have been Nos. 200, 242, 2723, 2731, 3561. |
SLS/194712 |
30/11/1947 |
Swindon Works |
Locos. entering Works during Nov. included: Nos. 905, 1001, 1010, 1413, 1450, 1713, 1799, 2327, 2722, 2781, 2838, 2864, 2868, 2927, 2941, 2979, 3186, 3383, 3817, 3834, 3852, 4039, 4056, 4058, 4073, 4088, 4089, 4919, 4925, 4969, 4979, 4995, 5008, 5042, 5070, 5078, 5336, 5355, 6115, 6136, 7311, W.D. 77291, 77393, 77508, 79278. Of these, 77291/393 and 79238 are ex Marston Sidings and repair in Belgium, and 77508/79278 are fitted with G.W. top feed clacks and cover and Wakefield lubricator. Works' pilots during November have included Nos. 242, 905, 1713 an 2781. 'Star' Class No. 4054 EXE was ex Works on 8/11, having been lined out. W.D. No. 78542 GLO was ex Works on 12/11. This is another loco. fitted with G.W. top feed clacks and cover and Wakefield lubricator. Locos. which have been condemned during November are: Nos. 200, 207, 898, 2783 an 3007. |
SLS/194801 |