Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 20 Online
» 1309 Today
» 5784 Yesterday
» 7093 Week
» 28482 Month
» 148009 Year
» 3174862 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
D2997 |
20/10/1962 |
|
TOPS (Tops) |
07013 |
12/1973 |
|
Liveries Carried - WIP
Code |
Colour |
Date From |
BFYE |
BR Blue bodywork, full yellow cab front |
by 06/1969 |
|
Modifications - WIP
Date Modified |
Order Number |
Modification |
Status |
Charged to Capital |
Charged to Revenue |
Total Cost |
11/1968 |
|
Air Brakes fitted |
|
|
|
|
01/12/1968 |
|
Air Brakes fitted |
|
|
|
|
Configuration - WIP
Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Diagram |
Source |
20/10/1962 |
v |
Vacuum brakes |
|
|
|
11/1968 |
x |
Dual brakes |
|
|
|
01/12/1968 |
x |
Dual brakes |
|
|
|
Preservation
Current Status |
Unknown |
|
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
20/10/1962 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number D2997 Built at Ruston & Hornsby Allocated to Southampton Docks (71I) |
|
|
07/02/1966 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Eastleigh (70D) |
|
|
11/1968 |
Modification |
Modification: Air Brakes fitted |
|
|
01/12/1968 |
Modification |
Modification: Air Brakes fitted |
|
|
06/1969 |
Livery |
Change of livery to BR Blue bodywork, full yellow cab front |
|
|
12/1973 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 07013 |
|
|
31/10/1975 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Bournemouth (BM) |
|
|
31/10/1976 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Eastleigh (EH) |
|
|
02/07/1977 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 07013 |
|
|