Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 35 Online
» 2369 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 15775 Week
» 68791 Month
» 188318 Year
» 3215171 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
D282 |
27/06/1960 |
|
TOPS (Tops) |
40082 |
02/1974 |
|
Locomotive Specifics
Class as Built |
40 |
Subclass/Rebuild History |
|
Wheels |
1Co-Co1 |
Builder |
English Electric Vulcan Foundry |
Fittings (as built) |
Train Brakes | Vacuum Brakes fitted | Steam Boiler | Stone OK4625 | Multiple Fitting | Blue Star | Other Details | Disc Route Indicators |
|
To Service |
27/06/1960 to York (North) (50A) |
Withdrawn |
08/11/1984 |
Time in Service |
24 yrs, 4 mths , 12 dys |
Cut Up |
01/1986 |
Cut At |
Locomotive Works (Crewe, Cheshire) |
Information |
Power unit damage |
Status |
Scrapped |
Liveries Carried - WIP
Code |
Colour |
Date From |
GNP |
All over Green including front of cab |
27/06/1960 |
BFYE |
BR Blue bodywork, full yellow cab front |
by 10/1970 |
|
Modifications - WIP
Date Modified |
Order Number |
Modification |
Status |
Charged to Capital |
Charged to Revenue |
Total Cost |
13/10/1969 |
|
Air Brakes fitted |
|
|
|
|
by 03/1973 |
|
Steam heat boiler isolated |
|
|
|
|
Configuration - WIP
Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Diagram |
Source |
27/06/1960 |
vb |
Vacuum brakes, Steam heat |
|
|
|
13/10/1969 |
xb |
Dual brakes, Steam heat |
|
|
|
by 03/1973 |
xi |
Dual brakes, Isolated boiler |
|
|
|
Fires
Date of Fire |
Severity |
Damage |
Source of Fire |
Material |
Details |
Location |
28/07/1970 |
Not severe |
|
Electrical overloads or arcs |
Electrical insulation |
Freight working |
|
|
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
27/06/1960 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number D282 Built at English Electric Vulcan Foundry Allocated to York (North) (50A) Livery applied: All over Green including front of cab |
|
|
08/10/1966 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Healey Mills (56B) |
|
|
25/03/1967 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Gateshead (52A) |
|
|
13/10/1969 |
Modification |
Modification: Air Brakes fitted |
|
|
10/1970 |
Livery |
Change of livery to BR Blue bodywork, full yellow cab front |
|
|
08/05/1971 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to York (North) (55B) |
|
|
03/02/1973 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Liverpool Division (D08) |
|
|
03/1973 |
Modification |
Modification: Steam heat boiler isolated |
|
|
02/1974 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 40082 |
|
|
08/11/1984 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 40082 |
|
|
01/1986 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by Locomotive Works: Crewe, Cheshire |
|
|