Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 23 Online
» 1629 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 19432 Week
» 72448 Month
» 191975 Year
» 3218828 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
D28 |
04/05/1961 |
|
TOPS (45/1) |
45124 |
11/04/1974 |
|
Locomotive Specifics
Class as Built |
45 |
Subclass/Rebuild History |
|
Wheels |
1Co-Co1 |
Builder |
Derby Works |
Fittings (as built) |
Train Brakes | Vacuum Brakes fitted | Steam Boiler | Stone OK4625 | Multiple Fitting | Blue Star | Other Details | Split Headcode Box No Gangway |
|
To Service |
04/05/1961 to Derby (17A) |
Withdrawn |
22/01/1988 |
Time in Service |
26 yrs, 8 mths , 18 dys |
Cut Up |
14/02/1992 |
Cut At |
MC Metals (Springburn) |
Status |
Scrapped |
Liveries Carried - WIP
Code |
Colour |
Date From |
BFYE |
BR Blue bodywork, full yellow cab front |
by 06/1969 |
BFYE |
BR Blue bodywork, full yellow cab front |
by 30/12/1970 |
|
Modifications - WIP
Date Modified |
Order Number |
Modification |
Status |
Charged to Capital |
Charged to Revenue |
Total Cost |
12/10/1968 |
|
Air Brakes fitted |
|
|
|
|
04/1974 |
|
Electric Train Heating (ETH) Fitted |
|
|
|
|
04/1974 |
|
Steam heat boiler removed |
|
|
|
|
Configuration - WIP
Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Diagram |
Source |
04/05/1961 |
vb |
Vacuum brakes, Steam heat |
|
|
|
12/10/1968 |
xb |
Dual brakes, Steam heat |
|
|
|
04/1974 |
xe |
Dual brakes, Electric Train Heating |
|
|
|
|
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
04/05/1961 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number D28 Built at Derby Works Allocated to Derby (17A) |
|
|
02/09/1961 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Neville Hill (55H) |
|
|
23/06/1962 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Neville Hill (55H) |
|
|
08/12/1962 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Holbeck (MR) (55A) |
|
|
12/10/1968 |
Modification |
Modification: Air Brakes fitted |
|
|
06/1969 |
Livery |
Change of livery to BR Blue bodywork, full yellow cab front |
|
|
30/12/1970 |
Livery |
Change of livery to BR Blue bodywork, full yellow cab front |
|
|
02/02/1974 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Toton (TO) |
|
|
04/1974 |
Modification |
Modification: Electric Train Heating (ETH) Fitted |
|
|
04/1974 |
Modification |
Modification: Steam heat boiler removed |
|
|
11/04/1974 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 45124 |
|
|
22/01/1988 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 45124 |
|
|
14/02/1992 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by MC Metals: Springburn |
|
|