Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 22 Online
» 1432 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 14838 Week
» 67854 Month
» 187381 Year
» 3214234 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
D2775 |
25/10/1960 |
|
|
Configuration - WIP
Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Diagram |
Source |
25/10/1960 |
v |
Vacuum brakes |
|
|
|
|
Works Visits
Where Repaired |
Date Stopped |
Days Since Last Stopped |
Works Entry |
Departure |
Class of Repair |
Waiting Repair Decision |
Waiting Works |
On Works |
Total Duration |
Cost of Repair |
Mileage |
Notes |
Cowlairs Works |
|
n/a |
18/10/1961 |
03/02/1962 |
General |
|
|
|
109 days |
|
18,915 |
DLRC |
Cowlairs Works |
|
n/a |
27/02/1962 |
03/03/1962 |
Non Classified |
|
|
|
5 days |
|
25,100 |
DLRC |
Cowlairs Works |
|
n/a |
11/12/1962 |
23/02/1963 |
Heavy Casual |
|
|
|
75 days |
|
|
DLRC |
St. Rollox Works |
|
n/a |
28/06/1965 |
27/08/1965 |
Unclassified |
|
|
|
61 days |
|
|
DLRC |
Cowlairs Works |
|
n/a |
06/05/1966 |
03/06/1966 |
Unclassified |
|
|
|
29 days |
|
|
DLRC |
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
25/10/1960 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number D2775 Built at North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow, Works Number 28028 Allocated to Grangemouth (65F) |
|
|
18/10/1961 |
Works Visit |
Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (General) - Arr: 18/10/1961. Dep: 03/02/1962. |
|
|
27/02/1962 |
Works Visit |
Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Non Classified) - Arr: 27/02/1962. Dep: 03/03/1962. |
|
|
11/12/1962 |
Works Visit |
Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Heavy Casual) - Arr: 11/12/1962. Dep: 23/02/1963. |
|
|
28/06/1965 |
Works Visit |
Works Visit - St. Rollox Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 28/06/1965. Dep: 27/08/1965. |
|
|
06/05/1966 |
Works Visit |
Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 06/05/1966. Dep: 03/06/1966. |
|
|
03/02/1968 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 2775 from Grangemouth (65F) |
|
|
10/1968 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by Campbells: Airdrie |
|
|