Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 9 Online
» 4265 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 17671 Week
» 70687 Month
» 190214 Year
» 3217067 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
D2763 |
04/07/1960 |
|
|
Allocations - WIP
Code |
Subsequent Codes |
Name |
|
From Date |
65A |
|
Eastfield (New) |
on |
04/07/1960 |
|
|
Withdrawn |
on |
24/06/1967 |
Configuration - WIP
Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Diagram |
Source |
04/07/1960 |
v |
Vacuum brakes |
|
|
|
|
Works Visits
Where Repaired |
Date Stopped |
Days Since Last Stopped |
Works Entry |
Departure |
Class of Repair |
Waiting Repair Decision |
Waiting Works |
On Works |
Total Duration |
Cost of Repair |
Mileage |
Notes |
Cowlairs Works |
|
n/a |
19/01/1963 |
30/03/1963 |
Light Casual |
|
|
|
71 days |
|
|
DLRC |
Cowlairs Works |
|
n/a |
19/08/1963 |
28/09/1963 |
Heavy Casual |
|
|
|
41 days |
|
|
DLRC |
St. Rollox Works |
|
n/a |
10/01/1964 |
08/02/1964 |
Unclassified |
|
|
|
30 days |
|
|
DLRC |
St. Rollox Works |
|
n/a |
09/10/1964 |
13/11/1964 |
Unclassified |
|
|
|
36 days |
|
|
DLRC |
St. Rollox Works |
|
n/a |
05/05/1965 |
29/05/1965 |
Unclassified |
|
|
|
25 days |
|
|
DLRC |
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
04/07/1960 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number D2763 Built at North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow, Works Number 28016 Allocated to Eastfield (65A) |
|
|
19/01/1963 |
Works Visit |
Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 19/01/1963. Dep: 30/03/1963. |
|
|
19/08/1963 |
Works Visit |
Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Heavy Casual) - Arr: 19/08/1963. Dep: 28/09/1963. |
|
|
10/01/1964 |
Works Visit |
Works Visit - St. Rollox Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 10/01/1964. Dep: 08/02/1964. |
|
|
09/10/1964 |
Works Visit |
Works Visit - St. Rollox Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 09/10/1964. Dep: 13/11/1964. |
|
|
05/05/1965 |
Works Visit |
Works Visit - St. Rollox Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 05/05/1965. Dep: 29/05/1965. |
|
|
24/06/1967 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 2763 |
|
|
04/1977 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by British Steel Corporation: Landore |
|
|