Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 14 Online
» 788 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 14194 Week
» 67210 Month
» 186737 Year
» 3213590 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
D2756 |
19/05/1960 |
|
|
Configuration - WIP
Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Diagram |
Source |
19/05/1960 |
v |
Vacuum brakes |
|
|
|
|
Works Visits
Where Repaired |
Date Stopped |
Days Since Last Stopped |
Works Entry |
Departure |
Class of Repair |
Waiting Repair Decision |
Waiting Works |
On Works |
Total Duration |
Cost of Repair |
Mileage |
Notes |
Cowlairs Works |
|
n/a |
21/03/1961 |
27/05/1961 |
Light Casual |
|
|
|
68 days |
|
2,059 |
DLRC |
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
19/05/1960 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number D2756 Built at North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow, Works Number 28009 Allocated to Eastfield (65A) |
|
|
29/08/1960 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Grangemouth (65F) |
|
|
27/02/1961 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Eastfield (65A) |
|
|
21/03/1961 |
Works Visit |
Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 21/03/1961. Dep: 27/05/1961. |
|
|
03/02/1968 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 2756 from Eastfield (65A) |
|
|
11/1968 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by Campbells: Airdrie |
|
|