Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 22 Online
» 1280 Today
» 5153 Yesterday
» 6433 Week
» 141249 Month
» 343913 Year
» 3370766 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
D2750 |
29/02/1960 |
|
|
Configuration - WIP
Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Diagram |
Source |
29/02/1960 |
v |
Vacuum brakes |
|
|
|
|
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
29/02/1960 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number D2750 Built at North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow, Works Number 28003 Allocated to St Margarets (64A) |
|
|
07/05/1962 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Kittybrewster (61A) |
|
|
20/12/1963 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Dundee Tay Bridge (62B) |
|
|
10/04/1966 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to St Margarets (64A) |
|
|
11/02/1967 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Leith Central (64H) |
|
|
03/08/1967 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 2750 |
|
|
11/1967 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by Connels: Coatbridge |
|
|