Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 22 Online
» 4345 Today
» 4868 Yesterday
» 23256 Week
» 88210 Month
» 290874 Year
» 3317727 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
D2742 |
30/01/1959 |
|
Liveries Carried - WIP
Code |
Colour |
Date From |
GNP |
All over Green including front of cab |
30/01/1959 |
|
Configuration - WIP
Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Diagram |
Source |
30/01/1959 |
v |
Vacuum brakes |
|
|
|
|
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
30/01/1959 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number D2742 Built at North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow, Works Number 27837 Allocated to Stirling (63B) Livery applied: All over Green including front of cab |
|
|
22/08/1964 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Eastfield (65A) |
|
|
06/03/1965 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Crewe Works (99C) |
|
|
11/02/1967 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 2742 |
|
|
09/1967 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by Slag Reduction Co.: Ickles |
|
|