Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 20 Online
» 2115 Today
» 4469 Yesterday
» 16158 Week
» 81112 Month
» 283776 Year
» 3310629 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
D2741 |
16/01/1959 |
|
Liveries Carried - WIP
Code |
Colour |
Date From |
GNP |
All over Green including front of cab |
16/01/1959 |
|
Configuration - WIP
Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Diagram |
Source |
16/01/1959 |
v |
Vacuum brakes |
|
|
|
Fires
Date of Fire |
Severity |
Damage |
Source of Fire |
Material |
Details |
Location |
12/10/1963 |
Not severe |
None |
Cinders from steam locomotives |
Not known |
Radiator assembly set on fire by sparks from external source. |
Grangemouth |
|
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
16/01/1959 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number D2741 Built at North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow, Works Number 27836 Allocated to Stirling (63B) Livery applied: All over Green including front of cab |
|
|
21/04/1962 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Grangemouth (65F) |
|
|
25/07/1964 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Dumfries (67E) |
|
|
13/02/1965 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Crewe Works (99C) |
|
|
11/02/1967 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 2741 |
|
|
09/1967 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by Slag Reduction Co.: Ickles |
|
|