Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 23 Online
» 4303 Today
» 4689 Yesterday
» 19915 Week
» 118560 Month
» 321224 Year
» 3348077 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
D2737 |
21/11/1958 |
|
Liveries Carried - WIP
Code |
Colour |
Date From |
GNP |
All over Green including front of cab |
21/11/1958 |
|
Configuration - WIP
Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Diagram |
Source |
21/11/1958 |
v |
Vacuum brakes |
|
|
|
|
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
21/11/1958 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number D2737 Built at North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow, Works Number 27832 Allocated to Yoker (65G) Livery applied: All over Green including front of cab |
|
|
25/01/1964 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to St Rollox (Balornock) (65B) |
|
|
26/11/1966 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Eastfield (65A) |
|
|
04/03/1967 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 2737 |
|
|
07/1967 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by Slag Reduction Co.: Ickles |
|
|