Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 19 Online
» 2765 Today
» 4616 Yesterday
» 33415 Week
» 132060 Month
» 334724 Year
» 3361577 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
D271 |
20/04/1960 |
|
TOPS (Tops) |
40071 |
03/1974 |
|
Locomotive Specifics
Class as Built |
40 |
Subclass/Rebuild History |
|
Wheel Arrangement |
1Co-Co1 |
Builder |
English Electric Vulcan Foundry |
Fittings (as built) |
Train Brakes | Vacuum Brakes fitted | Steam Boiler | Stone OK4625 | Multiple Fitting | Blue Star | Other Details | Disc Route Indicators |
|
To Service |
20/04/1960 to Gateshead (52A) |
Withdrawn |
07/09/1980 |
Time in Service |
20 yrs, 4 mths , 18 dys |
Cut Up |
m/e 10/1981 |
Cut At |
Locomotive Works (Swindon) |
Information |
Stored servicable 22/12/80 |
Status |
Scrapped |
Liveries Carried - WIP
Code |
Colour |
Date From |
GNP |
All over Green including front of cab |
20/04/1960 |
|
Modifications - WIP
Date Modified |
Order Number |
Modification |
Status |
Charged to Capital |
Charged to Revenue |
Total Cost |
10/04/1973 |
|
Air Brakes fitted |
|
|
|
|
Configuration - WIP
Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Diagram |
Source |
20/04/1960 |
vb |
Vacuum brakes, Steam heat |
|
|
|
10/04/1973 |
xb |
Dual brakes, Steam heat |
|
|
|
|
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
20/04/1960 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number D271 Built at English Electric Vulcan Foundry Allocated to Gateshead (52A) Livery applied: All over Green including front of cab |
|
|
29/01/1966 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to York (North) (50A) |
|
|
10/10/1970 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Gateshead (52A) |
|
|
06/05/1972 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to York (North) (55B) |
|
|
12/08/1972 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Healey Mills (55C) |
|
|
03/02/1973 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to York (North) (55B) |
|
|
10/04/1973 |
Modification |
Modification: Air Brakes fitted |
|
|
03/1974 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 40071 |
|
|
11/10/1975 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Gateshead (GD) |
|
|
07/09/1980 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 40071 |
|
|
10/1981 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by Locomotive Works: Swindon |
|
|