Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 23 Online
» 2635 Today
» 5000 Yesterday
» 28669 Week
» 127314 Month
» 329978 Year
» 3356831 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
Post 1948 (1955 Num) |
11702 |
21/08/1954 |
|
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
D2702 |
05/06/1959 |
|
|
Configuration - WIP
Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Diagram |
Source |
21/08/1954 |
|
No train brakes |
|
|
|
|
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
21/08/1954 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number 11702 Built at North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow, Works Number 27430 Allocated to West Hartlepool (51C) |
|
|
05/06/1959 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 2702 |
|
|
27/08/1960 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Goole (50D) |
|
|
12/03/1967 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 2702 |
|
|
06/1967 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by Drapers: Hull |
|
|