Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 22 Online
» 4358 Today
» 5000 Yesterday
» 30392 Week
» 129037 Month
» 331701 Year
» 3358554 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
D2608 |
09/12/1960 |
|
|
Configuration - WIP
Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Diagram |
Source |
09/12/1960 |
v |
Vacuum brakes |
|
|
|
|
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
09/12/1960 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number D2608 Built at Hunslet Engineering Co. Ltd. Allocated to Ardsley (56B) |
|
|
06/11/1965 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Bradford Hammerton Street (56G) |
|
|
22/04/1967 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Haymarket (64B) |
|
|
27/05/1967 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Dunfermline Upper (62C) |
|
|
30/12/1967 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 2608 |
|
|
01/1969 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by Campbells: Airdrie |
|
|