Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 5 Online
» 133 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 17936 Week
» 70952 Month
» 190479 Year
» 3217332 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
D259 |
05/02/1960 |
|
TOPS (Tops) |
40059 |
03/1974 |
|
Locomotive Specifics
Class as Built |
40 |
Subclass/Rebuild History |
|
Wheels |
1Co-Co1 |
Builder |
English Electric Vulcan Foundry |
Fittings (as built) |
Train Brakes | Vacuum Brakes fitted | Steam Boiler | Stone OK4625 | Multiple Fitting | Blue Star | Other Details | Disc Route Indicators |
|
To Service |
05/02/1960 to York (North) (50A) |
Withdrawn |
08/08/1977 |
Reason for Withdrawal |
Rundown condition |
Time in Service |
17 yrs, 6 mths , 3 dys |
Cut Up |
10/1978 |
Cut At |
Locomotive Works (Doncaster) |
Information |
Surplus to requirements,poor condition,required for spares |
Status |
Scrapped |
Liveries Carried - WIP
Code |
Colour |
Date From |
GNP |
All over Green including front of cab |
05/02/1960 |
BFYE |
BR Blue bodywork, full yellow cab front |
by 10/1970 |
|
Configuration - WIP
Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Diagram |
Source |
05/02/1960 |
vb |
Vacuum brakes, Steam heat |
|
|
|
|
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
05/02/1960 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number D259 Built at English Electric Vulcan Foundry Allocated to York (North) (50A) Livery applied: All over Green including front of cab |
|
|
13/02/1960 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Haymarket (64B) |
|
|
12/03/1960 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to York (North) (50A) |
|
|
08/10/1966 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Healey Mills (56B) |
|
|
28/01/1967 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to York (North) (50A) |
|
|
10/1970 |
Livery |
Change of livery to BR Blue bodywork, full yellow cab front |
|
|
12/08/1972 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Healey Mills (55C) |
|
|
03/02/1973 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to York (North) (55B) |
|
|
03/1974 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 40059 |
|
|
08/03/1975 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Gateshead (GD) |
|
|
29/02/1976 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Healey Mills (HM) |
|
|
02/05/1976 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to York (North) (YK) |
|
|
08/08/1977 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 40059 |
|
|
10/1978 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by Locomotive Works: Doncaster |
|
|