Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 9 Online
» 95 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 17898 Week
» 70914 Month
» 190441 Year
» 3217294 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
D2440 |
11/07/1960 |
|
TOPS (Tops) |
06009 |
04/1975 |
|
|
Configuration - WIP
Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Diagram |
Source |
11/07/1960 |
v |
Vacuum brakes |
|
|
|
|
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
11/07/1960 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number D2440 Built at Andrew Barclay, Sons & Co. Ltd., Kilmarnock Allocated to Corkerhill (67A) |
|
|
26/08/1967 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Eastfield (65A) |
|
|
27/04/1968 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Thornton Junction (62A) |
|
|
01/08/1970 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Dunfermline Townhill (62C) |
|
|
04/1975 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 06009 |
|
|
30/08/1975 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 06009 |
|
|
12/1977 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by Campbells: Airdrie |
|
|