Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 12 Online
» 609 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 14015 Week
» 67031 Month
» 186558 Year
» 3213411 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
D2432 |
22/02/1960 |
|
|
Configuration - WIP
Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Diagram |
Source |
22/02/1960 |
v |
Vacuum brakes |
|
|
|
|
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
0000 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by Unknown: Trieste, Italy |
|
|
22/02/1960 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number D2432 Built at Andrew Barclay, Sons & Co. Ltd., Kilmarnock Allocated to Hamilton (West) (66C) |
|
|
09/04/1960 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Polmadie (66A) |
|
|
30/09/1967 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Eastfield (65A) |
|
|
15/12/1968 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 2432 |
|
|