Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 20 Online
» 1163 Today
» 5153 Yesterday
» 6316 Week
» 141132 Month
» 343796 Year
» 3370649 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
D243 |
06/11/1959 |
|
TOPS (Tops) |
40043 |
30/01/1974 |
|
Locomotive Specifics
Class as Built |
40 |
Subclass/Rebuild History |
|
Wheel Arrangement |
1Co-Co1 |
Builder |
English Electric Vulcan Foundry |
Fittings (as built) |
Train Brakes | Vacuum Brakes fitted | Steam Boiler | Stone OK4625 | Multiple Fitting | Blue Star | Other Details | Disc Route Indicators |
|
To Service |
06/11/1959 to Gateshead (52A) |
Withdrawn |
31/01/1976 |
Time in Service |
16 yrs, 2 mths , 25 dys |
Cut Up |
m/e 04/1977 |
Cut At |
Locomotive Works (Crewe, Cheshire) |
Information |
Surplus to requirements,poor condition,required for spares |
Status |
Scrapped |
Liveries Carried - WIP
Code |
Colour |
Date From |
GNP |
All over Green including front of cab |
06/11/1959 |
BFYE |
BR Blue bodywork, full yellow cab front |
by 06/1969 |
|
Configuration - WIP
Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Diagram |
Source |
06/11/1959 |
vb |
Vacuum brakes, Steam heat |
|
|
|
|
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
06/11/1959 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number D243 Built at English Electric Vulcan Foundry Allocated to Gateshead (52A) Livery applied: All over Green including front of cab |
|
|
29/01/1966 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to York (North) (50A) |
|
|
03/12/1966 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Healey Mills (56B) |
|
|
16/09/1967 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Springs Branch (Wigan) (8F) |
|
|
06/01/1968 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Carlisle Kingmoor (12A) |
|
|
17/06/1968 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Preston Division (D10) |
|
|
06/1969 |
Livery |
Change of livery to BR Blue bodywork, full yellow cab front |
|
|
30/01/1974 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 40043 |
|
|
06/07/1974 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Longsight (LO) |
|
|
11/10/1975 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Carlisle Kingmoor (KD) |
|
|
31/01/1976 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 40043 |
|
|
04/1977 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by Locomotive Works: Crewe, Cheshire |
|
|