Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 12 Online
» 1439 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 19242 Week
» 72258 Month
» 191785 Year
» 3218638 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
D2420 |
14/02/1959 |
|
TOPS (Tops) |
06003 |
04/1974 |
|
|
Configuration - WIP
Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Diagram |
Source |
14/02/1959 |
v |
Vacuum brakes |
|
|
|
Preservation
Current Status |
Unknown |
|
Sightings
Report Date |
Title |
Location |
Report |
Headcode |
Reference |
01/03/1975 |
Eastfield shed visit |
Eastfield |
On shed |
|
Bruce Strong, Facebook |
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
14/02/1959 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number D2420 Built at Andrew Barclay, Sons & Co. Ltd., Kilmarnock Allocated to Kittybrewster (61A) |
|
|
30/09/1967 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Aberdeen Ferryhill (61B) |
|
|
03/07/1971 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Polmadie (66A) |
|
|
01/04/1972 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Eastfield (65A) |
|
|
04/1974 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 06003 |
|
|
01/02/1981 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 06003 |
|
|