Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 20 Online
» 3642 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 17048 Week
» 70064 Month
» 189591 Year
» 3216444 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
D2399 |
21/10/1961 |
|
TOPS (Tops) |
03399 |
03/1974 |
|
Locomotive Specifics
Class as Built |
03 |
Subclass/Rebuild History |
|
Wheels |
0-6-0 |
Builder |
Doncaster Works |
To Service |
21/10/1961 to Ashford (73F) |
Withdrawn |
05/07/1987 |
Time in Service |
25 yrs, 8 mths , 14 dys |
Status |
Preserved |
Liveries Carried - WIP
Code |
Colour |
Date From |
BFYE |
BR Blue bodywork, full yellow cab front |
by 06/1969 |
|
Modifications - WIP
Date Modified |
Order Number |
Modification |
Status |
Charged to Capital |
Charged to Revenue |
Total Cost |
06/1968 |
|
Air Brakes fitted |
|
|
|
|
Configuration - WIP
Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Diagram |
Source |
21/10/1961 |
v |
Vacuum brakes |
|
|
|
06/1968 |
x |
Dual brakes |
|
|
|
Preservation
Current Status |
Unknown |
|
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
21/10/1961 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number D2399 Built at Doncaster Works Allocated to Ashford (73F) |
|
|
28/05/1962 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Weymouth Radipole (GWR) (71G) |
|
|
19/04/1963 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Ashford (73F) |
|
|
08/04/1968 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Bournemouth (70F) |
|
|
06/1968 |
Modification |
Modification: Air Brakes fitted |
|
|
06/1969 |
Livery |
Change of livery to BR Blue bodywork, full yellow cab front |
|
|
11/11/1972 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Derby (16C) |
|
|
03/1974 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 03399 |
|
|
02/1977 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Colchester (CR) |
|
|
05/07/1987 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 03399 |
|
|