Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 14 Online
» 903 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 18706 Week
» 71722 Month
» 191249 Year
» 3218102 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
D2386 |
24/03/1961 |
|
TOPS (Tops) |
03386 |
07/1974 |
|
Liveries Carried - WIP
Code |
Colour |
Date From |
BFYE |
BR Blue bodywork, full yellow cab front |
by 18/08/1968 |
|
Configuration - WIP
Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Diagram |
Source |
24/03/1961 |
v |
Vacuum brakes |
|
|
|
|
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
24/03/1961 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number D2386 Built at Doncaster Works Allocated to Bidston (6F) |
|
|
13/05/1961 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Chester (MR) (6A) |
|
|
02/12/1961 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Monument Lane (21E) |
|
|
07/01/1967 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Tyseley (2A) |
|
|
11/03/1967 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Bescot (2F) |
|
|
06/04/1968 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Crewe Works (99C) |
|
|
18/05/1968 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Crewe Diesel (5A) |
|
|
18/08/1968 |
Livery |
Change of livery to BR Blue bodywork, full yellow cab front |
|
|
28/06/1969 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Derby (16C) |
|
|
07/1974 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 03386 |
|
|
20/12/1975 |
To Store |
To Store |
|
|
27/03/1976 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 03386 |
|
|
11/1976 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by Cohens: Kettering |
|
|