Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 26 Online
» 2705 Today
» 5610 Yesterday
» 29884 Week
» 20940 Month
» 367364 Year
» 3394217 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
D2383 |
16/11/1961 |
|
Locomotive Specifics
Class as Built |
03 |
Subclass/Rebuild History |
|
Wheel Arrangement |
0-6-0 |
Builder |
Swindon Works |
To Service |
16/11/1961 to Derby (17A) |
Withdrawn |
18/04/1971 |
Time in Service |
9 yrs, 5 mths , 2 dys |
Cut Up |
m/e 02/1972 |
Cut At |
T W Ward (Beighton) |
Status |
Scrapped |
|
Configuration - WIP
Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Diagram |
Source |
16/11/1961 |
v |
Vacuum brakes |
|
|
|
|
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
16/11/1961 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number D2383 Built at Swindon Works Allocated to Derby (17A) |
|
|
03/02/1968 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Wolverton Works () |
|
|
18/05/1968 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Bletchley (1E) |
|
|
27/07/1968 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Birkenhead Mollington Street (8H) |
|
|
09/05/1970 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Springs Branch (Wigan) (8F) |
|
|
05/09/1970 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Derby (16C) |
|
|
18/04/1971 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 2383 |
|
|
02/1972 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by T W Ward: Beighton |
|
|