Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 17 Online
» 53 Today
» 4469 Yesterday
» 14096 Week
» 79050 Month
» 281714 Year
» 3308567 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
D2376 |
07/09/1961 |
|
|
Configuration - WIP
Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Diagram |
Source |
07/09/1961 |
v |
Vacuum brakes |
|
|
|
|
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
07/09/1961 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number D2376 Built at Swindon Works Allocated to Sutton Oak (Peasley Cross) (8G) |
|
|
30/09/1961 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Birkenhead Mollington Street (6C) |
|
|
10/10/1964 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Derby (16C) |
|
|
29/07/1967 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Springs Branch (Wigan) (8F) |
|
|
11/05/1968 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 2376 from Springs Branch (Wigan) (8F) |
|
|
11/1968 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by Cohens: Kettering |
|
|