Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 5 Online
» 614 Today
» 5784 Yesterday
» 6398 Week
» 27787 Month
» 147314 Year
» 3174167 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
Departmental (Dept) |
92 |
31/12/1958 |
|
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
D2371 |
05/08/1967 |
|
TOPS (Tops) |
03371 |
02/1974 |
|
Locomotive Specifics
Class as Built |
03 |
Subclass/Rebuild History |
|
Wheels |
0-6-0 |
Builder |
Swindon Works |
To Service |
31/12/1958 to Lowestoft (32C) |
Withdrawn |
26/11/1987 |
Time in Service |
28 yrs, 10 mths , 26 dys |
Status |
Preserved |
|
Modifications - WIP
Date Modified |
Order Number |
Modification |
Status |
Charged to Capital |
Charged to Revenue |
Total Cost |
09/1968 |
|
Air Brakes fitted |
|
|
|
|
Configuration - WIP
Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Diagram |
Source |
31/12/1958 |
v |
Vacuum brakes |
|
|
|
09/1968 |
x |
Dual brakes |
|
|
|
Preservation
Current Status |
Unknown |
|
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
31/12/1958 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number D92 Built at Swindon Works Allocated to Lowestoft (32C) |
|
|
05/08/1967 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 2371 |
|
|
09/1968 |
Modification |
Modification: Air Brakes fitted |
|
|
28/09/1968 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Bradford Hammerton Street (55F) |
|
|
24/03/1973 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Healey Mills (55C) |
|
|
08/09/1973 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to York (North) (YK) |
|
|
02/1974 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 03371 |
|
|
25/07/1976 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Bradford Hammerton Street (HS) |
|
|
26/11/1987 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 03371 |
|
|