Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 9 Online
» 95 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 17898 Week
» 70914 Month
» 190441 Year
» 3217294 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
D237 |
09/10/1959 |
|
TOPS (Tops) |
40037 |
02/1974 |
|
Locomotive Specifics
Class as Built |
40 |
Subclass/Rebuild History |
|
Wheels |
1Co-Co1 |
Builder |
English Electric Vulcan Foundry |
Fittings (as built) |
Train Brakes | Vacuum Brakes fitted | Steam Boiler | Stone OK4625 | Multiple Fitting | Blue Star | Other Details | Disc Route Indicators |
|
To Service |
09/10/1959 to Gateshead (52A) |
Withdrawn |
16/08/1981 off Thornaby (TE) |
Time in Service |
21 yrs, 10 mths , 7 dys |
Cut Up |
11/1983 |
Cut At |
Locomotive Works (Swindon) |
Information |
Main generator |
Status |
Scrapped |
Liveries Carried - WIP
Code |
Colour |
Date From |
GNP |
All over Green including front of cab |
09/10/1959 |
|
Modifications - WIP
Date Modified |
Order Number |
Modification |
Status |
Charged to Capital |
Charged to Revenue |
Total Cost |
by 15/02/1969 |
|
Steam heat boiler removed |
|
|
|
|
Configuration - WIP
Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Diagram |
Source |
09/10/1959 |
vb |
Vacuum brakes, Steam heat |
|
|
|
by 15/02/1969 |
vo |
Vacuum brakes, No heat |
|
|
|
|
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
09/10/1959 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number D237 Built at English Electric Vulcan Foundry Allocated to Gateshead (52A) Livery applied: All over Green including front of cab |
|
|
10/10/1964 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Thornaby (51L) |
|
|
25/05/1968 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Gateshead (52A) |
|
|
15/02/1969 |
Modification |
Modification: Steam heat boiler removed |
|
|
12/08/1972 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Healey Mills (55C) |
|
|
02/1974 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 40037 |
|
|
05/1977 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Carlisle Kingmoor (KD) |
|
|
16/08/1981 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 40037 from Thornaby (TE) |
|
|
11/1983 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by Locomotive Works: Swindon |
|
|